Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 22 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2097 Week
» 27458 Month
» 260378 Year
» 1925754 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 73156 m/e 12/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 12/1956 to Neasden (34E)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/11/1967 off Bolton (9K)
Service Life 10 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
34E   Neasden (New) m/e 12/1956
41C   Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 10/05/1958
41B   Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 10/01/1959
17A   Derby w/e 17/09/1960
14D   Neasden w/e 24/09/1960
15E   Leicester (G.C.) w/e 30/06/1962
2F   Woodford Halse w/e 02/03/1963
14A   Cricklewood East w/e 18/05/1963
2L   Leamington w/e 10/10/1964
2A   Tyseley w/e 19/06/1965
9K   Bolton w/e 30/04/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 25/11/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 34E Neasden on 22/12/1956
LOAN 14D Neasden on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 14D Neasden on 23/02/1958
ALLOC 41C Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 24/01/1959
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 14D Neasden 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 4w/e 02/03/1963
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 2L Leamington w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 9K Bolton 4w/e 07/05/1966
WDN 9K Bolton w/e 25/11/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/11/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: 12000, 42332, 42404, 43368, 43826, 43905/75, 44033, 44581, 47268, 47529, 47666, Cecil Raikes. Gasworks Siding: 44263, 47472. Erecting Shop: D3015/22, 12054/68/84, 12100, 13123, 41804, 42421, 42503, 43593, 43620, 44130, 44241, 44401, 44560, 47298, 47521, 48009, 48110/85/92, 48304/80, 48467, 58850, 73073, 73156/8, 75030/52. Diesel Finishing Shop: D89, D140/2/3, D8017/37. Diesel Test House: D141, D211/26. Outside Diesel Test House: D43, D80, D2501. New Erecting Shop: D144-54. Diesel Shunter Test House: 13122. Paint Shop: M.R.1000. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2908/9, D5024, D5143, 10202/3, 11145. Outside Diesel Repair Shop: D2504, 11118. Shed Road: 41168, 42328, 42510/21/4, 43295. SLS/196112
17/11/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D44, D80, D2504, D2908/9/13, D8017/37, 10202, 11118/45. Former Paint Shop: D3122/3, D5143, 10203, 12100. Diesel Test House: D142/3. Shunter Test House: 12054. New Building: D141, D147-D156. Finishing Shop: D85, D144-D146. Erecting Shop: D3015/22, 12068/82/4, 42369, 42503, 43593, 43620, 43940/75, 44118, 44263, 44332, 44560, 47391/9, 47460/72, 47656, 48033, 48170/92, 48304, 48552, 58218, 58850 heavy repairs nearly completed, 73136/56. Paint Shop: D140, M.R. 1000 sheeted, 48110. In Works Sidings: ED3, 12000, 41168, 42328/95, 42404, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 43905, 44033, 44581, 47218/73, 47865/83, 47529/43, 48005, 73044, 73133/42/58. SLS/196112
15/12/1961 Derby MPD Ex Works on Shed: D2913, 41844, 44226/63/88, 47365/99, 47535/50, 48378, 48552, 73156. All main line and mixed traffic diesels are having a 2' - 3' high yellow band painted across their fronts above the buffer beams. SLS/196201
18/02/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay) Diesel Erecting Shop: D70/1, D82, D104, D116/7, D120, D138, D5013/25/7/76/85, D5144/86. Test House: D114/39, D5187. Diesel Finishing Shop: D6, D99, D5189/90/1. Paint Shop: D105 D3085, D5188. Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 47447/53, 48370, 73013/45/156, 75049/51, D109, D3056, ED6, ED7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D108, D2387, D3245/372, D5075/87; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5192-D5207 new construction. Works Yard: 40031, 42306/14, 42472, 42500, 43958, 44394, 47302/4, D42, D52/8, D64, D68, D80, D96, D107, D118, D3248, D3863, D5018, ED3. Stored outside Works office: 10000, 10201/2/3. SLS/196303
07/07/1968 Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. SLS/196810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 73156
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Neasden (34E)
   
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
24/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
02/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (2L)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
30/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
25/11/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 73156 from Bolton (9K)    

prev prev