Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 2426 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15832 Week
» 68848 Month
» 188375 Year
» 3215228 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73168 |
on |
18/04/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/04/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73168 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
31/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
20/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
19/12/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73168 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Bridgend |
|
|