Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1075 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14481 Week
» 67497 Month
» 187024 Year
» 3213877 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7427 |
on |
05/06/1937 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
74xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
307 |
To Service |
Mon 05/06/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/06/1964 |
Service Life |
27 yrs , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/06/1937 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7427 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
21/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
15/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7427 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|