Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 505 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7188 Week
» 18234 Month
» 18234 Year
» 1683610 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75009 on 16/10/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 390
To Service Sat 16/10/1951
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/08/1968
Scrapping During 11/1968 at Campbells (Airdrie)
Service Life 16 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 16/10/1951
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 03/10/1953
85A Worcester 4w/e 17/05/1958
85E Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 06/09/1958
82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 07/10/1961
89C Machynlleth 2w/e 17/11/1962
89B Croes Newydd w/e 09/03/1963
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 19/02/1966
6F Machynlleth w/e 16/07/1966
6D Shrewsbury w/e 10/12/1966
6C Croes Newydd w/e 11/03/1967
10D Lostock Hall w/e 13/05/1967
10A Carnforth w/e 24/06/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 03/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/10/1951
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 8w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 85E Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 2w/e 17/11/1962
ALLOC 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 12/03/1966
ALLOC 6F Machynlleth 4w/e 06/08/1966
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 4w/e 31/12/1966
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 5w/e 08/04/1967
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 5w/e 10/06/1967
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 08/07/1967
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 03/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1951 Swindon Works The last of the first lot of standard Class 4MT (75009 of lot 390) was ex Swindon works this week, and construction is carrying straight on with lot 391 of the same type (75010-75019). Two more 'Castles' rebuilt from 'Stars' have gone to the concentration yard, Nos. 4016 an 4032. Nos. 4057 an 7037 (both 82C), have recently been fitted with a small rectangular brass plate, above the LH number plate only, recording the fact that on 15th November, 1950, the former was driven by H.R.H. Princess Elizabeth from the works to the station, and that the latter was named Swindon by H.R.H. on her visit to the borough on its Jubilee celebrations. Nos. 6010 (83D) and 6013 (81A) have both been fitted with new 4-row superheater boilers, and mechanical lubricators. 4000 came into works this week, minus her RH name plate, and is undergoing repair. No. 43094 has now completed tests on Swindon Test Plant and on the road between Wantage Road and Stoke Gifford. (On 4th October, 1951, she took the dynamometer car and 17 empty coaches). She is being altered to her original condition and returned to her home shed, 31D. SLS/195112
12/10/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D36, D46, D73, D87, D100/31/44/88, D5011/30/79, D5136, 10001. Test House: D75, D5033. Outside Test House: D45, D66, D77, D93/4, D165 (loco. that was turned on its side on strike day), D185, D3056, D5021/75. Outside Shunter Test House: ED6, D2236, D3292. New Building : D184, D190-D193, D5186-5191. Finishing Shop: D38, D186/7, D5142, Pullman uM60091. Erecting Shop: ED7, D55, D123, D189, D2507, D2859, D2908/10, 13304, 42080/96, 44137, 47000, 47319 (being cut-up), 48009, 48214/79/85/6, 73031, 75009/18/54. Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42212. Stone Pit: 48718, 58137/63/6. Foundry Row: 42388, 42500, 47554, 73016, 73157. Klondyke Sidings: D84, 44020, 44122/43, 44435, 47588 (last five locos. frames only). Bone Yard: 10201/3. Ex Works on Shed: 42081 (12C), 42100 (5A), 44139 (16A), 44414 (15C), 44420 (17A), 48007 (21A), 48109 (21A), 75037 (1E). Research Dept.: E3030/71/87. SLS/196211
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303
27/03/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 44659, 45132, 46443, 48392, 70038, 75009, 76040, 92002/16/77/123/227, D209, D290/9, D307/9/20, D1100-6, D1554/6/62/5, D1712/31, D1750, D1998/9, D8025. Traverser area: D215/9/34/53/72, D300/35/79, D1507/53/63/95/6, D1601/10, D1720, D1906, 26042, E3041/9, 92093. Old Cutting up shop: D233, D1537, D1859, D5704, E3045. Electric Shop: E3037/67/168, 26013/31. Test Area: D343, D5277, D7568. New shop: D305, D1505/15/24/41, D1617, D5227/31, D7554, E3031. Paint shop: 45135/305, 46235, 70003, 71000, 92026, D1993-7, D5709, D8010, 26034/57. Stored or waiting works: 44890, 45374/99, 45600, 47681, 48555, 48762, 78034. SLS/196605
16/02/1968 CarnforthMPD (Out of use) Stored LMS 6441, 70013 (sheeted). In steam: 92009/77/88/118/67 Out of use: 44887/9, 45092/259, 48757, 70021, 75009/15/20/21/24/33/34/43/48/62, 92110/212. 92004 & Type 2 D.E. hauled 12.00 Heysham-Neville Hill oil tanks, and 44894 headed south with another tank train from the Barrow line at 11.00 hrs. SLS/196803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/10/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75009
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85E)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B)    
19/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
16/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (6F)    
10/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
13/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
24/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
03/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 75009    

prev prev