Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 297 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1998 Week
» 10113 Month
» 137556 Year
» 1802932 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75010 on 02/11/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 391
To Service Sat 02/11/1951
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/10/1967
Service Life 15 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 02/11/1951
6G   Llandudno Junction 4w/e 03/10/1953
6H   Bangor 4w/e 18/05/1957
6G   Llandudno Junction 4w/e 10/08/1957
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 09/03/1963
6C   Croes Newydd w/e 05/03/1966
10D   Lostock Hall w/e 13/05/1967
10A   Carnforth w/e 24/06/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 14/10/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 10C Patricroft w/e 03/11/1951
NEW NYA   m/e 30/11/1951
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 12/03/1966
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 5w/e 10/06/1967
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 08/07/1967
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 14/10/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1962 Nuneaton MPD The Ivatt Class 4 moguls transferred away to Bescot and Crewe South have been replaced by 75010/1/2/32/4/5/6/50 which have taken over all local goods and trip workings and the Coventry workmen's trains. On 3rd Nov. 34087, 145 Squadron, (70A) was serviced after running a special from Bournemouth-Coventry via Oxford and Leamington. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/11/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75010
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
05/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
13/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
24/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
14/10/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75010    
28/02/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev