Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 19 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4646 Week
» 6384 Month
» 133827 Year
» 1799203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75011 on 12/11/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 391
To Service Sat 12/11/1951
Withdrawal w/e Sat 05/11/1966
Service Life 14 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1967 at T W Ward (Beighton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 12/11/1951
6G   Llandudno Junction 4w/e 03/10/1953
17A   Derby w/e 25/05/1963
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 23/11/1963
10G   Skipton w/e 20/03/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 05/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 10C Patricroft w/e 17/11/1951
NEW NYA   m/e 30/11/1951
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 10G Skipton 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN   w/e 05/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/05/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D10, D214, D2903/12, D3069/88, D3172, D5022, 11114/6, 13119. Test House: D3, D9, D21, D31, D77, D223/69, D3245, D5034, 11119, 12052. New Building: D33-D43. Finishing Shop: D32, D94, D268, D5029/31/75/85. Erecting Shop: 42102, 42337, 42410, 44053/85, 44132, 44269, 44526/62, 47384/98, 47493, 47506/59, 48142/80, 48313, 48643/54/71, 73011/33/53/66, 73132, 75045. Paint Shop: D30, 42281, 47305/24, 48385, 48401. Ex Works on Shed: D2501, D2910, 42077, 42377, 47646, 483361 48639, 73157, 75043. In Works Sidings: D11, D3017, D5018/61/84/90, D5143, D8013, 12000/33, 41529/36, 41835, 42088, 42307, 42507/17/29, 43888, 43911/62/91, 44067, 44124, 47357, 47605, 58850, 73127, 75011. SLS/196106
14/06/1961 Derby MPD (Ex Works on Shed) Ex Works on Shed: D2910, 42517, 43991, 44124, 47288, 48643, 73033, 73127/32, 75011. SLS/196107
31/10/1962 Nuneaton MPD The Ivatt Class 4 moguls transferred away to Bescot and Crewe South have been replaced by 75010/1/2/32/4/5/6/50 which have taken over all local goods and trip workings and the Coventry workmen's trains. On 3rd Nov. 34087, 145 Squadron, (70A) was serviced after running a special from Bournemouth-Coventry via Oxford and Leamington. SLS/196212
16/06/1963 Derby Works (Foundry Row) Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41531 cut up, 41535, 73001/32, 75012, D147, D2396, D2507, D2911, D3017/21/3/56/68, D3305, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay-D3, D46, D62, D5008, D5133/48; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay-D5215-21, D7568-73. Finishing Shop: D81, D116/9, D5010. Paint Shop: 75064, D5213/4. Diesel Erecting Shop: D34, D52, D75, D97, D112, D134/5, D141, D160, D5024/82. Test House: D109, D5012/4/32/86, D5138, D5213. Yard (by paint shop): 42178, D2, D4, D6, D7, D42/3, D72, D98, D114, D131, D149, D154, D3122, D5002/9/13, D5142, D5206/10/1, ED4. Stone Pit: 63578, D2503. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 44417, 47341, 47429, 47465, 73007, 75011/50, D90. Stored outside offices: 43593, 43645, 43754, 47417, 10000/201/2/3. SLS/196307
12/07/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay) Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-47341, 47429, 47673, 73032, 75011, 75012, 75050, D134, D2504, D2911, D3024, D3123, D5013, ED6, ED7. Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D153, D5015, D5081, D5092, D5144. Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-(New) D5220, D5221, D5222, D5233, D7568, D7569, D7570, D7571, D7572, D7573, D7574, D7575, D7576, D7577 new. Finishing Shop: D97, D135, D5008, D5029, D5219. Paint Shop: D5217. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 48006, 48105/407, 73007/143, 75042, D2503. Diesel Erecting Shop: D42, D67, D79, D110, D115, D131, D136, D137, D141, D155, D5082. Yard by Paint Shop: D2, D3, D7, D56, D69, D72, D81, D124, D149, D154, ED4. Test House: D34, D91, D119, D5078, D218. Stone Pit: 73001, 73090, D5216. Stored outside offices: 10000, 10201/2/3. SLS/196308
15/08/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay) Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-41535, 75011/042/050, D2504, D2508, D2911, D3024/54/249/91; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D13, D69, D5015/28/81, D49, D72, D80/1, D91, D131/41/54/5, D5030/5. Test House: D7, D14, D47, D133/4/9; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-D5233-7, D7568-77 new. Diesel Shop: D6, D11, D37, D58, D90/2, D105, D5010/92/221. Paint Shop: 75012, D5220. Finishing Shop: D67/8, D79, D5008, D5204/22. Stone Pit: 44433, 48105. Foundry Row: 42472, 42500, 43599, 48006, 63658, 73067/090. Yard: D2, D3, D43, D59, D93, D114/5/20/49, D2221, D2902/7, D5027/76/82, D5395, ED4, ED7. As Derby is expected to cease steam repairs shortly, several engines have been sent to Crewe for repair/scrap. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/11/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75011
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
20/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
05/11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75011    
02/1967 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev