Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 4893 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20505 Week
» 119150 Month
» 321814 Year
» 3348667 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7502 |
08/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25152 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
25 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
08/10/1964 to Toton (16A) |
Withdrawn |
26/01/1984 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys |
Cut Up |
on 17/02/1985 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
08/10/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/02/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
01/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/10/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
06/02/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
01/1972 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
WR ATC, EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7502 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (16F) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
06/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
09/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25152 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
28/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
06/03/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
26/01/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25152 |
|
|
17/02/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|