Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 38 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5569 Week
» 7307 Month
» 134750 Year
» 1800126 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75026 on 13/05/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 400
To Service Sat 13/05/1954 to Laira (83D)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/12/1967
Service Life 13 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1968 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 890 13/05/1954 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
83D   Laira (New) on 13/05/1954
82C   Swindon m/e 16/06/1956
89A   Oswestry 4w/e 26/01/1957
6E   Chester West 4w/e 06/09/1958
84E   Tyseley w/e 11/04/1959
89C   Machynlleth 4w/e 11/07/1959
89B   Croes Newydd w/e 09/03/1963
8K   Bank Hall w/e 06/02/1965
8L   Aintree w/e 22/10/1966
10G   Skipton w/e 19/11/1966
10A   Carnforth w/e 08/04/1967
12E   Tebay w/e 22/04/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 30/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 22/05/1954
NEW NYA   m/e 31/05/1954
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 26/01/1957
LOAN 6E Chester West 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/09/1958
ALLOC 6E Chester West 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/04/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 02/05/1959
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 8K Bank Hall 3w/e 06/02/1965
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 12/11/1966
ALLOC 10G Skipton 3w/e 03/12/1966
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 5w/e 08/04/1967
ALLOC 12E Tebay 4w/e 06/05/1967
WDN 12E Tebay w/e 30/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/12/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop: 1 bay) Paint shop-42337, 42518, 43960, 73044, 12043, D5005. D/E Erecting shop-10203, 10800, 12035, 13026/37/9, 15004, ED2, ED7, and last two of order D658 D3571/2. Test House-D3570, D5006. Erecting shop: 1 bay-42410G, 42421I, 44247G, 44276I, 44408G, 4463G, 47165I, 47464I, 48371I, 48403G, 48408G, 48637G, 48760I, 75026G, 80081I, 1 bay stripping-42378, 42381; Erecting shop: 2 bay-42516I, 44501G, 48063I, 48322I, 2 bay stripping-44009, 44400; Erecting shop: 3 bay-D5008-14 New, Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D1, 3, 4 & 5, 1Co-Co1 2300 H.P.; Works Yard-40047, 40680, 41083, 41090, 42534, 43186, 43856, 44053, 47309, 48533, 48611, 48639, 12096, D2(fr.), D3569, D5084/7. Locomotives stored-40538, 43881, 43930, 44142, 44369, 58132 an 49418. SLS/195901
30/05/1959 Chester MPD (6E) The W.R. has taken over all freight workings of this shed (now under LMR control) and as a result have gained back from the LMR all the locomotives transferred in exchange for W.R. types. Engines transferred LMR to WR to cover these freight workings are-48402/12/5/7/8/24/30/44/71, 73021/3/4/5/6, 75005/6/26. The only engines left at 6E now are several 82XXX tanks and a few standards. SLS/195907
30/09/1962 Standard Class 4 Double Chimneys Three more Standard Class 4 4-6-Os have been rebuilt with double chimneys at Swindon Works since last advised, as below: 75002 6/62, 75008 9/62, 75026 7/62. SLS/196210
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Tender Tender fitted: BR2 number 890    
13/05/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75026
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
26/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (89A)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (6E)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B)    
06/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
19/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
08/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (12E)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75026    
07/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle    

prev prev