Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 298 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1999 Week
» 10114 Month
» 137557 Year
» 1802933 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75032 on 30/06/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service Sat 30/06/1953 to Bletchley (1E)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/02/1968
Service Life 14 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1968 at T W Ward (Beighton)

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 896 30/06/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
1E   Bletchley (New) on 30/06/1953
6G   Llandudno Junction 4w/e 26/02/1955
6A   Chester (MR) 4w/e 31/12/1955
6G   Llandudno Junction m/e 16/06/1956
6A   Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956
6H   Bangor 4w/e 10/08/1957
6G   Llandudno Junction 4w/e 30/11/1957
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 12/09/1959
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 23/06/1962
27C   Southport w/e 25/05/1963
27A   Bank Hall w/e 20/07/1963
5D   Stoke w/e 05/02/1966
12E   Tebay w/e 13/05/1967
10A   Carnforth w/e 06/01/1968
     Withdrawn w/e 17/02/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/06/1953
NEW 1E Bletchley w/e 04/07/1953
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 3w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 05/02/1966
ALLOC 12E Tebay 5w/e 10/06/1967
ALLOC 10A Carnforth w/e 06/01/1968
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 17/02/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/08/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop-1 bay) 29th August. Paint shop- 40010 G, 42369 G, 43948 I, 44147 I, 47635 I, 75039 G, D3542/3 new, D5001 new; Diesel shop- 10203, 15000 I, 15004 Casual, D3544-D3554 (order no. 658); Erecting shop-1 bay, 40038 G, 42420 I, 42526 G, 44035 I, 44519 G, 44577 G, 47236 G, 47574 G, 47597 G, 48410 I, 75017 I, 75030/3 G, 80137 I, 80138 G, also 53803, 75032, 80061; Erecting shop-2 bay, 43621 G, 44045 I, 44241 G, 44371 G, 47230 G, 48642 G, 48672 G, 53805 I, also 44046 an 48461; Erecting shop-3 bay, 10 Bo-Bos (D5002-11, three engines in), 3 1-Co-Co-ls (D1-3, no engines in). Yard- 40047, 40680, 41078, 41156, 42508, 43631, 43918, 47309, 48176, 75013 an 12098. Test House- D5000 an 10800. SLS/195809
17/09/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop-no. 1 bay) 17th September. Paint shop- 42420 I, 80061 G, D3546/7 new, D5002 new; Test House-D8000; Diesel shop- 10203, 12089, 13056, 15004, D3548-56/8 (new work order no. D658); Erecting shop-no. 1 bay- 40038 G, 42333 I, 42526 G, 43225 I, 44564 G, 47366 G, 48008 G, 48176 I, 48212 G, 48393 I, 73093 I, 75032 G, 75033 G, 80139 I, stripping-42404, 43760, 73040 G, Erecting shop-no. 2 bay- D3557 new, 42525 G, 44100 G, 44137 I, 47666 I, 48060 I, 48461 I, 48672 G, stripping-42305, 44200, 47308, 58115; Works yard- 40005, 40047, 40680, 42508, 43815, 44602, 47309, 48378/87, 75043, 80043, 15000, D3542, D8013. SLS/195810
19/09/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. SLS/196110
31/10/1962 Nuneaton MPD The Ivatt Class 4 moguls transferred away to Bescot and Crewe South have been replaced by 75010/1/2/32/4/5/6/50 which have taken over all local goods and trip workings and the Coventry workmen's trains. On 3rd Nov. 34087, 145 Squadron, (70A) was serviced after running a special from Bournemouth-Coventry via Oxford and Leamington. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Tender Tender fitted: BR2 number 896    
30/06/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75032
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bletchley (1E)
   
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
31/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
20/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
05/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
13/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (12E)    
06/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
17/02/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 75032    
05/1968 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev