Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 20 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4647 Week
» 6385 Month
» 133828 Year
» 1799204 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75033 on 03/07/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service Sat 03/07/1953 to Bletchley (1E)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/12/1967
Service Life 14 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1968 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 897 03/07/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
1E   Bletchley (New) on 03/07/1953
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 26/02/1955
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 09/06/1956
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 15/09/1956
6K   Rhyl w/e 22/06/1957
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 16/09/1957
6K   Rhyl w/e 15/06/1959
6E   Chester West w/e 06/09/1959
11B   Workington w/e 09/04/1960
6B   Mold Junction w/e 11/06/1960
6K   Rhyl w/e 05/05/1962
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 22/09/1962
2B   Nuneaton w/e 20/10/1962
27C   Southport on 19/05/1963
27A   Bank Hall w/e 20/07/1963
     Stored on 08/11/1965
27A   Bank Hall (Reinstated) on 07/02/1966
     Stored on 27/03/1966
27A   Bank Hall (Reinstated) on 30/03/1966
9F   Heaton Mersey on 04/04/1966
6A   Chester (MR) on 24/04/1966
6C   Croes Newydd w/e 21/05/1966
6D   Shrewsbury w/e 21/01/1967
6C   Croes Newydd w/e 11/03/1967
10A   Carnforth w/e 29/04/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 30/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1E Bletchley w/e 04/07/1953
NEW NYA   m/e 31/07/1953
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 6E Chester West 3w/e 26/09/1959
LOAN 11B Workington 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 09/04/1966
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 07/05/1966
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 5w/e 11/06/1966
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 4w/e 01/02/1967
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 5w/e 08/04/1967
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 06/05/1967
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 30/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Derby Works 28/11/1955 21/12/1955 24 days Intermediate    
Derby Works 07/08/1958 26/09/1958 51 days Heavy General    
Derby Works 28/02/1961 29/03/1961 30 days Light Intermediate    
Eastleigh Works 02/04/1965 15/05/1965 44 days Heavy Intermediate    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/08/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop-1 bay) 29th August. Paint shop- 40010 G, 42369 G, 43948 I, 44147 I, 47635 I, 75039 G, D3542/3 new, D5001 new; Diesel shop- 10203, 15000 I, 15004 Casual, D3544-D3554 (order no. 658); Erecting shop-1 bay, 40038 G, 42420 I, 42526 G, 44035 I, 44519 G, 44577 G, 47236 G, 47574 G, 47597 G, 48410 I, 75017 I, 75030/3 G, 80137 I, 80138 G, also 53803, 75032, 80061; Erecting shop-2 bay, 43621 G, 44045 I, 44241 G, 44371 G, 47230 G, 48642 G, 48672 G, 53805 I, also 44046 an 48461; Erecting shop-3 bay, 10 Bo-Bos (D5002-11, three engines in), 3 1-Co-Co-ls (D1-3, no engines in). Yard- 40047, 40680, 41078, 41156, 42508, 43631, 43918, 47309, 48176, 75013 an 12098. Test House- D5000 an 10800. SLS/195809
17/09/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop-no. 1 bay) 17th September. Paint shop- 42420 I, 80061 G, D3546/7 new, D5002 new; Test House-D8000; Diesel shop- 10203, 12089, 13056, 15004, D3548-56/8 (new work order no. D658); Erecting shop-no. 1 bay- 40038 G, 42333 I, 42526 G, 43225 I, 44564 G, 47366 G, 48008 G, 48176 I, 48212 G, 48393 I, 73093 I, 75032 G, 75033 G, 80139 I, stripping-42404, 43760, 73040 G, Erecting shop-no. 2 bay- D3557 new, 42525 G, 44100 G, 44137 I, 47666 I, 48060 I, 48461 I, 48672 G, stripping-42305, 44200, 47308, 58115; Works yard- 40005, 40047, 40680, 42508, 43815, 44602, 47309, 48378/87, 75043, 80043, 15000, D3542, D8013. SLS/195810
13/03/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED2, D3, D232, D2501/8, D2909/10, D3052, D3126, D3778, D8006, 10203, 11116, 12077, 13119. Test House: ED4, D16, D79, D213/21, D5092, 12000. New Building: D9, D25-D33. Finishing Shop: D23/4, D5090, D5133, 10202. Erecting Shop: 42067, 42500/27, 44376, 47202/97, 47313, 47415/30, 47577, 47612/40, 48000/24/81, 48133, 48216, 48607/17/44, 48728, 53806, 75033/9/50/9, 92129. Paint Shop: D22, M1000, 42221, 42317, 43885, 44542, 48351. In Works Sidings: D210, D3172, D5065/72, 40695, 41536, 42134, 42300/67, 42414, 43306, 43574, 44480, 47204, 47312/8/47/72, 47408/39, 47507, 48063, 48121/43, 48153, 48219, 48690, 58850. Ex Works Shed: 10000, 42211, 42391, 42508, 44085, 44264, 44581, 47416, 48701, 75016. SLS/196104
16/02/1968 CarnforthMPD (Out of use) Stored LMS 6441, 70013 (sheeted). In steam: 92009/77/88/118/67 Out of use: 44887/9, 45092/259, 48757, 70021, 75009/15/20/21/24/33/34/43/48/62, 92110/212. 92004 & Type 2 D.E. hauled 12.00 Heysham-Neville Hill oil tanks, and 44894 headed south with another tank train from the Barrow line at 11.00 hrs. SLS/196803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/07/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75033
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bletchley (1E)
Tender fitted: BR2
   
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
28/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 28/11/1955. Dep: 21/12/1955.    
09/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
15/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
22/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
16/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
07/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/08/1958. Dep: 26/09/1958.    
15/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
06/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (6E)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (11B)    
11/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
28/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/02/1961. Dep: 29/03/1961.    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
20/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
19/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
20/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
02/04/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/04/1965. Dep: 15/05/1965.    
08/11/1965 To Store To Store    
07/02/1966 Reinstated Reinstated to Bank Hall (27A)    
27/03/1966 To Store To Store    
30/03/1966 Reinstated Reinstated to Bank Hall (27A)    
04/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
24/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
21/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
21/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
29/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75033    
06/1968 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev