Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 322 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2023 Week
» 10138 Month
» 137581 Year
» 1802957 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75050 on 09/11/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 408
To Service Sat 09/11/1956 to Llandudno Junction (6G)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/11/1966
Service Life 10 yrs , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1967 at Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2A 1014 09/11/1956 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
6G   Llandudno Junction (New) on 09/11/1956
6A   Chester (MR) 8w/e 05/10/1957
6H   Bangor w/e 23/06/1962
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 15/09/1962
27A   Bank Hall w/e 25/05/1963
5D   Stoke w/e 05/02/1966
5E   Nuneaton w/e 12/03/1966
5D   Stoke w/e 04/06/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 26/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 10/11/1956
NEW NYA   m/e 30/11/1956
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 05/02/1966
ALLOC 5E Nuneaton 5w/e 12/03/1966
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 11/06/1966
WDN   w/e 26/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/11/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop:- M.R. 1000, 40026 G, 40031 G, 42350 I, 42540 I, 44428/521 I. 75013 I, D3795 New, D5028 New, D8 New; Diesel Erecting Shop:-12036/94, 13053; New Work:-6D-E.Sh. D3797-802uc; Test House:-D3796; Erecting Shop:-No. 1 Bay, 40039 G, 42387 I, 42527 G, 42537 G, 43887 G, 44104 G, 44109 I, 44143 I, 44296 I, 47286 G, 47292 I, 47522 I, 47592 G, 47673 G, 48609/69 G, 73131/7 I, 75063 I, Stripping:-42412/28stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 2 Bay:- 44197 I, 44735 Cas, 75036 I; Stripping:- 73066stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 3 Bay:- 10 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E, 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E; Diesel Finishing Shop:-D5/7, D5029; Yard:-40513/680/925, 42312/21/54/85/88/507/80, 43233/47 94/370/531/766/85/829/934/98, 44694, 47309, 48000, 75050, 80065/82, 10100/800, 12093, D6, ED6. Cecil Raikes. SLS/195912
13/03/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED2, D3, D232, D2501/8, D2909/10, D3052, D3126, D3778, D8006, 10203, 11116, 12077, 13119. Test House: ED4, D16, D79, D213/21, D5092, 12000. New Building: D9, D25-D33. Finishing Shop: D23/4, D5090, D5133, 10202. Erecting Shop: 42067, 42500/27, 44376, 47202/97, 47313, 47415/30, 47577, 47612/40, 48000/24/81, 48133, 48216, 48607/17/44, 48728, 53806, 75033/9/50/9, 92129. Paint Shop: D22, M1000, 42221, 42317, 43885, 44542, 48351. In Works Sidings: D210, D3172, D5065/72, 40695, 41536, 42134, 42300/67, 42414, 43306, 43574, 44480, 47204, 47312/8/47/72, 47408/39, 47507, 48063, 48121/43, 48153, 48219, 48690, 58850. Ex Works Shed: 10000, 42211, 42391, 42508, 44085, 44264, 44581, 47416, 48701, 75016. SLS/196104
12/07/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings ) Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. SLS/196108
14/08/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D223/33, D2503, D3017, D5025, D5134/5. Diesel Test House: D43, D220, D3053, D5144, 12092. Shunter Test House: 12069. New Building: D46-D49, D138-D143. Finishing Shop: D44/5, D226/88, D8010. Erecting Shop: D3016/58, 13122, 13250, 42082, 42178, 42374, 42523, 42697, 44123, 44215, 44380, 44528, 47345/85/93, 48004/24, 48211, 48312/24/82, 48469, 48621, 48729, 73127. Paint Shop: MR1000, 42501, 44135, 44203, 48193. In Works Sidings: D230, 12000/96, D2501, 41532, 41835, 42307/49/60, 42415, 42506/10/31, 43846, 43905, 44171, 44278, 44527, 47268, 47629/62, 48218, 48765, 58850, 73125, 75050. SLS/196109
31/10/1962 Nuneaton MPD The Ivatt Class 4 moguls transferred away to Bescot and Crewe South have been replaced by 75010/1/2/32/4/5/6/50 which have taken over all local goods and trip workings and the Coventry workmen's trains. On 3rd Nov. 34087, 145 Squadron, (70A) was serviced after running a special from Bournemouth-Coventry via Oxford and Leamington. SLS/196212
16/06/1963 Derby Works (Foundry Row) Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41531 cut up, 41535, 73001/32, 75012, D147, D2396, D2507, D2911, D3017/21/3/56/68, D3305, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay-D3, D46, D62, D5008, D5133/48; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay-D5215-21, D7568-73. Finishing Shop: D81, D116/9, D5010. Paint Shop: 75064, D5213/4. Diesel Erecting Shop: D34, D52, D75, D97, D112, D134/5, D141, D160, D5024/82. Test House: D109, D5012/4/32/86, D5138, D5213. Yard (by paint shop): 42178, D2, D4, D6, D7, D42/3, D72, D98, D114, D131, D149, D154, D3122, D5002/9/13, D5142, D5206/10/1, ED4. Stone Pit: 63578, D2503. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 44417, 47341, 47429, 47465, 73007, 75011/50, D90. Stored outside offices: 43593, 43645, 43754, 47417, 10000/201/2/3. SLS/196307
12/07/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay) Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-47341, 47429, 47673, 73032, 75011, 75012, 75050, D134, D2504, D2911, D3024, D3123, D5013, ED6, ED7. Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D153, D5015, D5081, D5092, D5144. Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-(New) D5220, D5221, D5222, D5233, D7568, D7569, D7570, D7571, D7572, D7573, D7574, D7575, D7576, D7577 new. Finishing Shop: D97, D135, D5008, D5029, D5219. Paint Shop: D5217. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 48006, 48105/407, 73007/143, 75042, D2503. Diesel Erecting Shop: D42, D67, D79, D110, D115, D131, D136, D137, D141, D155, D5082. Yard by Paint Shop: D2, D3, D7, D56, D69, D72, D81, D124, D149, D154, ED4. Test House: D34, D91, D119, D5078, D218. Stone Pit: 73001, 73090, D5216. Stored outside offices: 10000, 10201/2/3. SLS/196308
15/08/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay) Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-41535, 75011/042/050, D2504, D2508, D2911, D3024/54/249/91; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D13, D69, D5015/28/81, D49, D72, D80/1, D91, D131/41/54/5, D5030/5. Test House: D7, D14, D47, D133/4/9; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-D5233-7, D7568-77 new. Diesel Shop: D6, D11, D37, D58, D90/2, D105, D5010/92/221. Paint Shop: 75012, D5220. Finishing Shop: D67/8, D79, D5008, D5204/22. Stone Pit: 44433, 48105. Foundry Row: 42472, 42500, 43599, 48006, 63658, 73067/090. Yard: D2, D3, D43, D59, D93, D114/5/20/49, D2221, D2902/7, D5027/76/82, D5395, ED4, ED7. As Derby is expected to cease steam repairs shortly, several engines have been sent to Crewe for repair/scrap. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/11/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75050
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)
Tender fitted: BR2A
   
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
05/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
12/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E)    
04/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
26/11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75050    
06/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield    

prev prev