Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 58 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2984 Week
» 4722 Month
» 132165 Year
» 1797541 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75060 on 02/05/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 408
To Service Sat 02/05/1957 to Leicester Midland (15C)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/04/1967
Service Life 9 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2A 1024 02/05/1957 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
15C   Leicester Midland (New) on 02/05/1957
17A   Derby w/e 22/09/1962
8R   Walton on the Hill w/e 23/11/1963
8L   Aintree w/e 14/12/1963
8A   Edge Hill w/e 26/06/1965
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 02/04/1966
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 30/04/1966
6C   Croes Newydd w/e 21/05/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 22/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 15C Leicester Midland w/e 04/05/1957
NEW 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 18/05/1957
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/05/1957
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 8R Walton on the Hill 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 09/04/1966
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 07/05/1966
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 5w/e 11/06/1966
WDN   w/e 22/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/12/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D92, D2220, D2504, D2908/9, D5091, D8037, 11118/55. Former Paint Shop: D77, D107, D2506. Test House: D88, D98, D146/7/50, D5019, 10202, 12068. Shunter Test House: 12082. New Building: D152-D161. Finishing Shop: D149/51, D2503, D5016, D8016. Erecting Shop: 12088, 12101, 42416, 42588, 43929, 44043, 44202/11/44, 44401, 44539, 47307/22, 47435/64, 47649, 48005/50/61, 48334, 73044, 73133, 75031/60. Paint Shop: D148, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42366, 58850 (bearing cast iron plate mounted in the centre of each side tank with the number 2650 and the words L.&-N.W.R. BOW WORKS 1880). Works Sidings: ED3, 12000/62, 13169, 41168, 42236, 42328/30/2/63/95, 42404/12, 42448, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 47161, 47218, 47444, 47664, 48079, 48392, 48495, 58174/5, 73142. SLS/196201
04/01/1962 Derby MPD Ex Works on Shed: D148/50, 47435/64, 47649. 48005. 48334, 73044, 75060. SLS/196202
21/01/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay) Diesel Erecting Shop: D35, D79, D85, D92, D102, D113, D159, D165, D303, D5008/10/23/5. Test House: D87, D125/6, D3567, D5000/22/76/89. Paint Shop: 73068/74. Diesel Finishing Shop: D152, D5018, D5186/7. Pullman Car uM60093. Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-41712 G, 44394, 47471, 47597/9, 73014/40/69, 75045/60, Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D139, D2387, D2507, D2908, D3085, D5002/3, D5381, Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-D5188-5202 under construction, note correction of numbers from those quoted in last month's journal. Works Yard: 10000, 10201/2/3 all stored awaiting decision outside works offices, D8, D60/3, D72, D96, D110/4/8, D154, D5006/79/138, 42500, 43428, 44228 frames, 44260, ED6 an ED7 frames. SLS/196302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/05/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75060
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Leicester Midland (15C)
Tender fitted: BR2A
   
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (8R)    
14/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
26/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
02/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
30/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
21/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
22/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75060    
10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth    

prev prev