Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 511 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7194 Week
» 18240 Month
» 18240 Year
» 1683616 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75061 on 15/05/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 408
To Service Sat 15/05/1957 to Leicester Midland (15C)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/02/1967
Scrapping During 06/1967 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)
Service Life 9 yrs, 8 mths , 20 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2A 1025 15/05/1957 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
15C Leicester Midland (New) on 15/05/1957
17A Derby w/e 22/09/1962
8R Walton on the Hill w/e 23/11/1963
8L Aintree w/e 14/12/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 04/02/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 15C Leicester Midland on 15/05/1957
NEW 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 18/05/1957
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/05/1957
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 8R Walton on the Hill 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   w/e 04/02/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/08/1958 Leicester (G.C.) Of the four B.R. locomotives on loan from the M.R. shed (75057/61, 73138 and 92164) only the 9F is liked, which might account for its regular use on the ' Master Cutler ' or other express. SLS/195809
14/01/1960 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R.1000, 43911 I, 44274 G, 48097 G, 48205 I, 75054 I. Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12097/8, 13090, D5004, D8209. New Work: 6 D-E Sh., 0-6-0 (D3937-D3942). Test House: D5068/9/70. Diesel Finishing Shop: D7/10, D5016/71/2. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42394 G, 42502/13 G, 43342/682 I, 44098/381 G, 47377/429/45 G, 48181 I, 48355 G, 48382/436 I, 48607 G, 75051/61/4 I, Str., 48338/545. Erecting Shop, No. 2.Bay: 42315 G, 42533 I, 44160 I, 73133/4 (Cas.) Str., 42293, 43832. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: D1, 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E (D5073-81). 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E (D11-D14). Yard: 40413. 41763, 42354, 43370, 43531/828, 47309/67, 48387/424, 10100/800, D4/5/6/9, D5014. SLS/196002
12/03/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay) D42, D78, D82, D99, D107, D117/9, D120/1, D5027/88, D5393. Outside: D5002/18, D5189. Test House: D48, D113/8, D3372, D5136/87/8/91/2/3. Diesel Finishing Shop: D70, D5010, D5194/5/6. Paint Shop: D5190. Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 43637, 44393, 48619, 73045, 75061, D8, D2913, D3020, D5012, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D54, D109, D5083/4; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5197-D5210 new. Works yard: 40026, 42392/422/72/500, 42784, 44004/112, 44228 frames, 44519, 47003, 47276, 58138, 73159, u60093, D64, D94, D111, D130, D5005/31. Stored outside Works offices: 10000/201/2/3. SLS/196304
30/04/1963 Oswestry Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay) Oswestry Works in April contained ex GSWR 0-6-0T ex Hafod Colliery (NBL 21621 of 1917). SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/05/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75061
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Leicester Midland (15C)
Tender fitted: BR2A
   
22/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (8R)    
14/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
04/02/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75061    

prev prev