Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 61 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4976 Week
» 16213 Month
» 249133 Year
» 1914509 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75070 on 13/10/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 409
To Service Sun 13/10/1955 to Exmouth Junction (72A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 11/09/1966
Service Life 10 yrs, 10 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR1B 1034 13/10/1955 BR 4,725g 7t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
72A   Exmouth Junction (New) on 13/10/1955
71G   Bath Green Park (S&D) 6w/e 15/06/1956
71A   Eastleigh 6w/e 01/04/1957
75A   Brighton w/e 11/03/1959
75E   Three Bridges 6w/e 09/02/1960
75D   Stewarts Lane 4w/e 24/09/1962
70A   Nine Elms 4w/e 19/08/1963
70D   Eastleigh 4w/e 08/06/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 11/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 72A Exmouth Junction on 13/10/1955
NEW NYA   m/e 31/10/1955
ALLOC 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 9w/e 01/04/1957
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane q/e 12/01/1959
ALLOC 75A Brighton 8w/e 11/03/1959
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 6w/e 09/02/1960
ALLOC 75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 24/09/1962
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 8w/e 19/08/1963
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh P 06/06/1965
WDN   w/e 11/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Tender Tender fitted: BR1B number 1034    
13/10/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75070
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)
   
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (71G)    
01/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
09/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
19/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
11/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75070    
03/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev