Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3153 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16559 Week
» 69575 Month
» 189102 Year
» 3215955 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7536 |
12/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25186 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
12/03/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/03/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
06/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7536 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
12/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
10/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
07/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
12/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
11/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25186 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
28/11/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25186 |
|
|
01/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|