Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3135 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16541 Week
» 69557 Month
» 189084 Year
» 3215937 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7542 |
09/04/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25192 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
09/04/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/08/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
02/1979 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/04/1965 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
07/08/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
02/1979 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
eX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/04/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7542 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
07/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
10/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25192 |
|
|
12/04/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
02/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/05/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25192 |
|
|
30/11/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|