Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1833 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15239 Week
» 68255 Month
» 187782 Year
» 3214635 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7584 |
01/02/1964 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25234 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/02/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
01/02/1964 |
Power Unit VA800 |
|
|
|
01/02/1964 |
Steam Heat Boiler 21177 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/02/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7584 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
22/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
25/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25234 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
24/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (white blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
27/02/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25234 |
|
|
30/06/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|