Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1022 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18825 Week
» 71841 Month
» 191368 Year
» 3218221 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76002 |
on |
11/12/1952 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
BR2 |
915 |
12/07/1958 |
BR |
3,500g |
6t 0cwt |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
66B |
|
Motherwell (New) |
on |
11/12/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
66B |
Motherwell |
on |
11/12/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works Visits
Works |
Stopped |
Entry |
Departure |
Duration |
Level of Work |
Actual |
Mileage |
Doncaster Works |
|
12/02/1953 |
06/03/1953 |
23 days |
Light Casual |
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
17/05/1955 |
28/06/1955 |
43 days |
Heavy Intermediate |
|
|
Cowlairs Works |
|
10/12/1957 |
13/12/1957 |
4 days |
Non Classified |
|
|
Cowlairs Works |
|
12/06/1958 |
12/07/1958 |
31 days |
Light Intermediate |
|
|
Cowlairs Works |
|
15/02/1961 |
25/03/1961 |
39 days |
General |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/12/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76002 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
12/02/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/02/1953. Dep: 06/03/1953. |
|
|
17/05/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/05/1955. Dep: 28/06/1955. |
|
|
10/12/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 10/12/1957. Dep: 13/12/1957. |
|
|
12/06/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 12/06/1958. Dep: 12/07/1958. |
|
|
12/07/1958 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: BR2 number 915 |
|
|
15/02/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1961. Dep: 25/03/1961. |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76002 |
|
|
05/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|