Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1852 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15258 Week
» 68274 Month
» 187801 Year
» 3214654 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76003 |
on |
19/12/1952 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
66B |
|
Motherwell (New) |
on |
19/12/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/03/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
66B |
Motherwell |
on |
19/12/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/03/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/12/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76003 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
12/04/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/04/1955. Dep: 27/05/1955. |
|
|
07/11/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 07/11/1957. Dep: 16/11/1957. |
|
|
13/05/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 13/05/1958. Dep: 06/06/1958. |
|
|
30/06/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/06/1959. Dep: 06/08/1959. |
|
|
09/11/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 09/11/1960. Dep: 19/11/1960. |
|
|
11/12/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1961. Dep: 19/01/1962. |
|
|
17/02/1965 |
Works Visit |
|
|
|
25/03/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76003 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|