Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 4307 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17713 Week
» 70729 Month
» 190256 Year
» 3217109 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76011 |
on |
23/03/1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
8w/e |
03/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
72C |
Yeovil Town |
P |
30/09/1958 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
q/e |
12/01/1959 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
25/10/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/07/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
25/06/1960 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/08/1967 |
Salisbury MPD |
On 12th August, the following locomotives were in store at Salisbury (70E): USA 0-6-0T 30064/7/9/71/2, W/C Pacific 34102, WC/BB Pacific (Reb.) 34018/21/4/5/37/40/56/60/87/9/90/8, 34104/8, LMS 2-6-2T 41312/9, BR 5MT 4-6-0 73022/9/43/65/85/93, 73115/7/8/55, BR 4MT 4-6-0 75074/5/7, BR 4MT 2-6-0 76005/6/7/11/31/64/6/7, BR 4MT 2-6-4T 80015/6/133/9/40/3/5/6/51/2 and BR 3MT 2-6-2T 82019/29. |
SLS/196709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/03/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76011 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
20/10/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/10/1955. Dep: 11/11/1955. |
|
|
11/06/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1958. Dep: 11/07/1958. |
|
|
13/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C) |
|
|
11/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
27/01/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/01/1960. Dep: 06/02/1960. |
|
|
08/06/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/06/1960. Dep: 25/06/1960. Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
25/06/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
13/09/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 13/09/1960. Dep: 01/10/1960. |
|
|
26/06/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/06/1961. Dep: 06/07/1961. |
|
|
10/09/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/09/1962. Dep: 22/09/1962. |
|
|
27/11/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1963. Dep: 04/01/1964. |
|
|
10/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76011 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Morriston |
|
|