Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 495 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14538 Week
» 79492 Month
» 282156 Year
» 3309009 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76013 |
on |
15/04/1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
70F |
Bournemouth |
4w/e |
12/10/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/09/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/05/1963 |
Eastligh MPD (Waiting Works) |
Waiting Works: DS682, 30031/65/70/89, 30105/10/99, 30328, 30513/39, 30936, 31612, 31861/6, 31906/8/9, 32503, 33009, 34046/84, 35012, 76013/4. Ex Works: D6527, 31803/53, 35004, 82023. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/04/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76013 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
20/01/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/01/1955. Dep: 29/01/1955. |
|
|
29/12/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/12/1955. Dep: 14/01/1956. |
|
|
10/04/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/04/1957. Dep: 13/04/1957. |
|
|
03/12/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1957. Dep: 04/01/1958. |
|
|
05/01/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/01/1959. Dep: 17/01/1959. |
|
|
10/08/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/08/1960. Dep: 27/08/1960. |
|
|
18/01/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/01/1961. Dep: 01/02/1961. |
|
|
06/06/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1963. Dep: 17/08/1963. |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
04/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76013 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Buttigiegs: Newport |
|
|