Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 917 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14323 Week
» 67339 Month
» 186866 Year
» 3213719 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76015 |
on |
13/05/1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
71A |
Eastleigh |
9w/e |
26/05/1953 |
ALLOC |
71B |
Bournemouth |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
03/10/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/05/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76015 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
07/09/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/09/1954. Dep: 18/09/1954. |
|
|
15/03/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955. |
|
|
11/01/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/01/1956. Dep: 04/02/1956. |
|
|
27/06/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/06/1957. Dep: 13/07/1957. |
|
|
02/04/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 02/04/1958. Dep: 09/04/1958. |
|
|
23/10/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1958. Dep: 15/11/1958. |
|
|
14/09/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/09/1959. Dep: 25/09/1959. |
|
|
14/10/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 14/10/1960. Dep: 05/11/1960. |
|
|
06/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
01/12/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 01/12/1961. Dep: 13/12/1961. |
|
|
12/02/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/02/1963. Dep: 16/03/1963. |
|
|
01/01/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/01/1964. Dep: 14/01/1964. |
|
|
03/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76015 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|