|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brighton Works | 15/03/1955 | 29/04/1955 | 46 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Brighton Works | 22/07/1955 | 06/08/1955 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Brighton Works | 23/02/1956 | 16/04/1956 | 54 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Brighton Works | 27/08/1956 | 20/09/1956 | 25 days | Non Classified | |||
Eastleigh Works | 15/01/1958 | 01/02/1958 | 18 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 17/08/1960 | 03/09/1960 | 18 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Eastleigh Works | 26/02/1962 | 03/03/1962 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Eastleigh Works | 01/01/1963 | 09/02/1963 | 40 days | General | |||
Eastleigh Works | 24/06/1965 | 01/07/1965 | 8 days | Non Classified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/02/1962 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: D2250, D3042, D3271, D6500/3, 33020, 41324, 76025/9. Erecting Shop: D3471, D5012/4, D6506/7/14/63, E6002, L.S.W.R. 120, 15212, 30045, 30515/42/5, 30781, 30838/43, 30955, 31413, 31795/8, 32636/46, 33039, 34002/11/8/24/66, 35025, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76016/63, 80010, 80141/51, 92239. Behind Erecting Shop: 30059, 30475/6, 30692, 30864, 80064. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/05/1953 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 76016 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
||
15/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1955. Dep: 29/04/1955. | ||
22/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/07/1955. Dep: 06/08/1955. | ||
23/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/02/1956. Dep: 16/04/1956. | ||
27/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Brighton Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 27/08/1956. Dep: 20/09/1956. | ||
15/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1958. Dep: 01/02/1958. | ||
17/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/08/1960. Dep: 03/09/1960. | ||
26/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1962. Dep: 03/03/1962. | ||
01/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1963. Dep: 09/02/1963. | ||
24/06/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Non Classified) - Arr: 24/06/1965. Dep: 01/07/1965. | ||
27/06/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (70C) | ||
02/10/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 76016 | ||
06/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |