Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3931 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17337 Week
» 70353 Month
» 189880 Year
» 3216733 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76034 |
m/e |
12/1953 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76034 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
16/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
13/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76034 |
|
|
10/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by P Woods (Shipbreaking): Queenborough |
|
|