Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 624 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14030 Week
» 67046 Month
» 186573 Year
» 3213426 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76052 |
on |
06/09/1956 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/09/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76052 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H) |
|
|
14/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (14D) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
12/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
29/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
17/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
07/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76052 |
|
|
06/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|