Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76054 |
on |
30/04/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
75B |
Redhill |
on |
26/04/1955 |
ALLOC |
72B |
Salisbury |
5w/e |
06/05/1960 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
8w/e |
22/06/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/10/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/04/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76054 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
06/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
18/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76054 |
|
|
03/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Hayes: Bridgend |
|
|