Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 693 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14736 Week
» 79690 Month
» 282354 Year
» 3309207 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76092 |
on |
28/06/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
67A |
Corkerhill |
on |
28/06/1957 |
ALLOC |
67B |
Hurlford |
4w/e |
09/05/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/08/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/06/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76092 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
09/08/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76092 |
|
|
11/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|