Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 56 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17859 Week
» 70875 Month
» 190402 Year
» 3217255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76093 |
on |
11/07/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
67A |
Corkerhill |
on |
11/07/1957 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
14/01/1961 |
ALLOC |
67A |
Corkerhill |
2w/e |
21/10/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/02/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/07/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76093 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
22/02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76093 |
|
|
04/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|