Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D7638 30/01/1965  
TOPS (Tops) 25288 06/10/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 25
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
25/330/01/1965
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
To Service 30/01/1965 to Tinsley (41A)
Withdrawn 19/02/1987
Time in Service 22 yrs , 20 dys
Cut Up 31/03/1988
Cut At Vic Berry (Leicester)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Tinsley (New) on 30/01/1965
41C Wath w/e 23/04/1966
10A Carnforth w/e 15/07/1967
91M To London Midland Region w/e 22/07/1967
10A Carnforth w/e 22/07/1967
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/05/1968
D08 Liverpool Division on 17/06/1968
   Withdrawn on 19/02/1987

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
09/1973   Dual Braked        


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
30/01/1965 To Service To service as British Railways Number 7638
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Allocated to Tinsley (41A)
   
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
15/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
22/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
22/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
18/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08)    
09/1973 Modification Modification: Dual Braked    
06/10/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 25288    
19/02/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 25288    
31/03/1988 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester    

prev prev