Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1279 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14685 Week
» 67701 Month
» 187228 Year
» 3214081 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7643 |
08/02/1966 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
25293 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
08/02/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
20/01/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/02/1966 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
20/01/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/02/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7643 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
01/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
01/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
08/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
09/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
07/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
20/01/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 25293 |
|
|
06/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
01/02/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 25293 |
|
|
08/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|