Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1066 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18869 Week
» 71885 Month
» 191412 Year
» 3218265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7715 |
on |
19/05/1930 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Kerr Stuart |
Order Number |
279 |
Works Number |
4450 |
To Service |
Sun 19/05/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 19/05/1963 |
Service Life |
33 yrs |
Information |
Originally scheduled for withdrawal on 12/12/1962. Became stock of LTE on withdrawal. |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
83E |
St Blazey |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
4w/e |
27/01/1962 |
OFFSTOCK |
UNK |
|
4w/e |
27/07/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/04/1963 |
Withdrawn panniers reinstated? |
Note on W. Reg. withdrawals : A member has reported seeing two locos at Swindon recently (ex-works) which have been given as withdrawn in official W. Reg. notices. The two locos. GWR7715 and GWR5775 both given in the March fournal appear either to have been re-instated or notified in error. If any member is able to supply any official data the Editor would be glad to hear. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/05/1930 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7715 Built at Kerr Stuart, Works Number 4450 |
|
|
07/03/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (SBZ) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Blazey (SBZ) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (83E) |
|
|
27/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
19/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7715 |
|
|