|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1958 | Pantyffynnon | Allocation here on 30th June was 4223, 5209, 5223/47, 5703, 7718/76, 8708/45/85. | SLS/195808 |
19/02/1961 | Swindon Works (Triangle) | Gas Works Sidings: 1502/9, 1603/52, 3638/49, 3704, 4203, 5103/10/76, 6752/3/61/76, 7740, 8406/76, 9400/14/47/9/58, 9795. Stock Shed Yard: 1361/4, 1410/33/54, 4644, 5920, 6158, 6336, 7410/3, 7761, 8473. Triangle: 1366, 2227, 3799, 4170, 4287, 4587, 4978, 5207, 5519, 6425, 6864, 6979, 7704/76, 8457. Works Yard: 1014/25, 1625/9, 2207, 2516, 4099, 4701, 4902/15/81/5, 5025, 6003, 6131, 6945/53/61, 7000/20, 7325, 7775/94, 7902, 8454, 9481, 9701/49, 18000, 78000/8, L.T.E. L91. 'A' Shop: D604, D800/9/11/8/20/66-70, D1000-5, D2187-92, D3000/27, D3182, D6301/3/5, 7, 1017, 3806, 4073/4, 4128/31/48, 4274, 4574, 4919/24/7/30/5/54, 5008/19/27/9/32/68/71, 5900/23/72/85/6, 6023/7/9, 6122/44/7, 6368, 6822/51, 6917/29/36/51, 7033, 7908, 15100/4, 70024, 82032/9, 92232. Dump: 1601/2/10/20/59, 2813/9/32, 4550/9/94, 5331/91, 5510/4, 6333/52, 6775, 8419, 9462. 'C' Shop: 1616/44, 2846, 4281, 6382. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1930 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 7776 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1132 |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Llanelli (LLY) | ||
31/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
10/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (LLY) | ||
29/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
26/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (LLY) | ||
20/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
17/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
17/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
31/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
19/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
11/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
31/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
08/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
12/01/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7776 | ||
07/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |