Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 246 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4223 Week
» 15460 Month
» 248380 Year
» 1913756 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 7777 m/e 11/1930

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1133
To Service During 11/1930
Withdrawal Wed 09/11/1960
Service Life 30 yrs , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1961 at Cohens (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1930
85A   Worcester 4w/e 28/01/1956
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 12/06/1958
85A   Worcester 4w/e 01/11/1958
     Withdrawn on 09/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 01/11/1958
WDN   on 09/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Swindon Works Locos entering works during November: 13, 28, 1003, 1785, 2189, 2202/39/91, 2669, 2741, 2854, 2921/34/81, 3004/44, 3183, 3366, 3435/43, 3638, 3775/98, 3802/4/13/4/7/38/57/65, 4000/16/53/74/82/95/8, 4272 4543, 4643/58, 4826, 4965/82; 5005/17/20/6, 5125/37, 5327/50/84, 5413, 5502/23, 5735/8/59/69, 5905/16/23/32/3/9/58/69, 6002/8, 6125/57, 6353/97; 6846, 6951/4, 7243, 7712/8/73/4/7/84, 8755, 9797. The advent of a K3 to Swindon works has been commented upon in the January Journal: it has a hole in its blast pipe, a bad regulator blow-through.and a hot box on one of the driving wheels. It may be recalled that B12/3 8539 was seen on the works turntable in 1944 when she was on loan to W.D. for working Ambulance Trains, but it is not known whether, on that occasion, she had entered the works or was merely using the turntable due to some defect of the one at the shed.
The scale of withdrawals has been so great that the concentration yard has been overwhelmed, and some of the locos are stored in a road adjacent to the main line-2381/5, 2406, 1161, 3439, 2732/59 being noted- there on 21/12. Both latter engines had been dead at the home sheds for some time before their withdrawal.
SLS/194602
28/02/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering works during February included: 2933, 2938, 2979, 2981, 3024, 3029, 3030, 3407, 3449, 3588, 4018, 4052, 4060, 4061, 4083, 4093, 4320, 5042, 5054, 5305, 5341, 5367, 6312, 6320, 6338, 6340, 6374, W.D. 70843, 77196, 77288, 78632, and 79234. Works' pilots during the same period included: 1796, 2044, and 2077. Further 'Panniers' fitted with T.F. boilers are: 3758, 3789, 5760, 7777, 8776 and 9771. 2891 and 3804 have both been fitted with side windows, side sheets and doors between engine and tender sides. SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1930 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 7777
Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1133
   
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
09/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 7777    
03/1961 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev