Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 337 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2038 Week
» 10153 Month
» 137596 Year
» 1802972 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 78003 on 31/12/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service Sat 31/12/1952 to Oswestry (89A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/12/1966
Service Life 13 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
89A   Oswestry (New) on 31/12/1952
89C   Machynlleth 4w/e 18/04/1953
85A   Worcester 4w/e 22/03/1958
89C   Machynlleth 4w/e 17/05/1958
6H   Bangor w/e 25/05/1963
1A   Willesden w/e 19/06/1965
5E   Nuneaton w/e 02/10/1965
6D   Shrewsbury w/e 15/01/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 17/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/12/1952
ALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 5E Nuneaton 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 4w/e 05/02/1966
WDN   w/e 17/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/02/1953 Swindon Works Arrivals from Darlington for fitting of A.T.C. Gear and other W.R. modifications, 78002. Tender B.R. 3. 941/52. 78003. Tender B.R. 3. 942/52 and 78004. Tender B.R. 3. 943/52, these are due to be allocated to the Central Wales Division. Dean 0-6-0s withdrawn from scrapping, noted in East Yard, Reception Shed, Dump and C. Shop : 2350 -; 2401 (89B); 2408 -; 2449 (89A); 2462 -; 2468 (89B); 2515 (85C); 2534 (82D); 2537 (86C); 2543, 2573 (81D). Eastern Region 60845 was noted fitted with Indicator Shelter on front end. SLS/195304
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 78003
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Oswestry (89A)
   
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E)    
15/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
17/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 78003    
09/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev