Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 78019 m/e 03/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 03/1954 to Kirkby Stephen (51H)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/11/1966
Service Life 12 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
51H   Kirkby Stephen (New) m/e 03/1954
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 30/04/1960
8E   Northwich w/e 10/06/1961
1A   Willesden w/e 25/05/1963
5E   Nuneaton w/e 02/10/1965
5B   Crewe South w/e 15/01/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 12/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 51H Kirkby Stephen on 30/03/1954
ALLOC 12E Kirkby Stephen on 01/02/1958
LOAN 12E Kirkby Stephen on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 8E Northwich 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 5E Nuneaton 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 05/02/1966
WDN   w/e 12/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/02/1967 Crewe South MPD (Stored) Stored-45033, 46512, 48255/502, 78019/36/59. SLS/196704
07/07/1968 Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. SLS/196810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 78019
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E)    
15/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
12/11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 78019    

prev prev