Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3273 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16679 Week
» 69695 Month
» 189222 Year
» 3216075 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
78040 |
on |
11/12/1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/12/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 78040 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Bank Hall (27A) |
|
|
23/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
11/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
22/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 78040 |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|