Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 270 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1971 Week
» 10086 Month
» 137529 Year
» 1802905 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 78043 on 25/12/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Sat 25/12/1954 to Bank Hall (27A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/10/1965
Service Life 10 yrs, 9 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
27A   Bank Hall (New) on 25/12/1954
27B   Aintree 4w/e 01/12/1956
27A   Bank Hall 4w/e 23/03/1957
27B   Aintree w/e 15/09/1962
1A   Willesden w/e 25/05/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 02/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 27A Bank Hall w/e 25/12/1954
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 27B Aintree 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 01/06/1963
WDN   w/e 02/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/10/1961 Crewe Works (Outside Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196111
15/10/1961 Crewe Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/12/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 78043
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Bank Hall (27A)
   
01/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
02/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 78043    
01/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev