Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 336 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2037 Week
» 10152 Month
» 137595 Year
» 1802971 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 78044 m/e 12/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 12/1954 to Bank Hall (27A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/05/1967
Service Life 12 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
27A   Bank Hall (New) m/e 12/1954
27B   Aintree w/e 15/09/1962
10D   Lostock Hall w/e 28/12/1963
8L   Aintree w/e 11/04/1964
16D   Nottingham w/e 23/05/1964
16A   Toton w/e 03/04/1965
9K   Bolton w/e 12/11/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 06/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 27A Bank Hall w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 27B Aintree 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 16D Nottingham 5w/e 06/06/1964
ALLOC 16A Toton 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 9K Bolton 5w/e 12/11/1966
WDN   w/e 06/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/08/1964 Crewe Works (Works Yard) Arrival Sidings: 41264, 42233/581/651, 44836/8/934, 45005/38/249, 46487, 48050/205/301/556/617, 78023, 84028. Paint Shop: D1589, D1611/2/3/5/6, 26057, 27006, L.M.S. 6233 Duchess of Sutherland (painted in L.M.S. livery for Butlin's Camp, Ayrshire), 49395, Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D230/41/82, D302/22, D1610, D6826/36, 48641. Paint Shop Yard: 42210/152, 48158/62/462, 78010, 92203. Diesel Test Road: D207, D1614, D8053. Erecting Shop: New Construction D1619-D1636 in various stages of construction, D203/74/6/9/83, D304/6/29/33/84/6, D5719, D6843, D8009/13/17/55, 42134/577/611, 44695/946, 45003/338, 45558, 48104/36/215/18/87/305/531/710/67, 92001/59/166/77, 92205/12. No. 9 Shop: D1617/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 48010/193/466, 84026, 92042. Works Yard: D217/8/89/91, D350, D5706/16, D6758, D8045, 42115/697, 44593/937, 45297/325, 48002/153/267/426/548/53/676, 70001/9/36/51, 78044. Electric Traction Shop: E3021, 26033/52, D288, D315/24. Scrap Road: 48069/155/203/310/657/745, 84021/2. Dismantling Shed: 42090/614/86, 48335/64/494/540, 84025, 92065. SLS/196409
20/09/1964 Crewe Works (Paint Shop Yard) Paint Shop: D1622 painted, D1623 undercoat, D1626 undercoat, D1627 undercoat, D6786, 26049. Arrival Sidings: 42233, 42267, 42651, 42665, 44667, 45031, 45038, 45249, 48050, 48056, 48153, 48205, 48206, 48252, 48267, 48301, 48365, 48558, 48617, 78023, 92157. Works Siding adjacent to Scrap Road: 48069, 48155, 48202, 48310, 48657. Scrap Road: 42092, 48341, 84023. Traction Shop: D338, D371, E3012, 26025, 27004, 27005. Traction Shop Yard: D203, D274, D304, D379, D1646, D1647, D1648, D1649, D1650, D1651 shell, D8055. Erecting Shop Yard: D221, D232, D348, 42115, 48450, 70031. Minor Repair Road: 44688, 45195, 45455. Erecting Shop: D237, D244, D290, D301, D306, D329, D370, D380, D1624 undercoat, D1628 undercoat, D1629 undercoat, D1630 motors mounted, D1631 motors mounted, D1632 motors mounted, D1633, D1634, D1635, D1636, D1637, D1638, D1639, D1640, D1641, D1642, D1643, D1644, D1645 shell, D5706, D6768, D8017, D8056, 42436, 42546, 44664, 44779, 44814, 44835, 45005, 45327, 46487, 48057, 48218, 48247, 48335, 48351, 48356, 48357, 48364, 48435, 48540, 70022, 84015, 84025. Works Yard: 42186, 42421, 42608, 44663, 44715, 44803, 44857, 45103, 45307, 45392, 45716, 46491, 48002, 48024, 48081, 48160, 48334, 48552, 48721, 70033, 70034, 70053, 92024, 92100, 92139, 92206, 92223, 92231. Paint Shop Yard: D213, D276, D283, D354, D1621 painted, D333, D1625 undercoat, D6788, D8045, D8052, 42072, 45112, 45325, 48253, 48548, 48676, 70001, 70009, 70044, 78044. SLS/196410

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 78044
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Bank Hall (27A)
   
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
11/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
23/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16D)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
06/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 78044    
10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev