Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 35 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 853 Week
» 17804 Month
» 170757 Year
» 1836133 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 78054 m/e 12/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 12/1955 to Motherwell (66B)
Withdrawal Thu 16/12/1965
Service Life 10 yrs , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1966 at Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
66B   Motherwell (New) m/e 12/1955
61B   Aberdeen Ferryhill 8w/e 27/10/1956
61C   Keith 8w/e 22/12/1956
61B   Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
64F   Bathgate 4w/e 25/07/1964
     Withdrawn on 16/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 66B Motherwell on 08/12/1955
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 64F Bathgate 4w/e 11/07/1964
WDN   on 16/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/09/1964 Inverurie Works (In Shops) Shopped in 25 weeks ending 29th August: 44880, 44999, 45011, 45194, 64620, 65915, 76096, 76114, 80128, D3552, D3902, D5328, D6110/20/43/46, D8029/33/34. Scrapped 9th-28th March: 61117, 45465. no scrapping after that date. In Shops: 44956, 45016, 45213, 78054, D2414, D6116/17/19/38/41/52/55/56, D8576. Stored: 62712. In the above period there were unscheduled repairs on 13 steam locomotives and 70 diesel locomotives. The Clayton locomotives are being fitted with AWS, ten to date. (I regret the length of time which has elapsed between this and the last report but the epidemic prevented visits). SLS/196410
14/10/1964 Inverurie Works (Shopped) Shopped during the five weeks ending 9th October : 44718, 78054, D3558; In shops for minor repairs, modification, etc.: 44956, 45016, 46464, 64608, D264, D2416/23, D3902, D5116/21/27/30/32, D5214, D5300, D6116/36/42/48/52/55, D8094, D8554/71/76; in shops : 44925, 65905, D2414, D3549, D6117/19/38/51; Stored: 62712. SLS/196411

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 78054
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Motherwell (66B)
   
27/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
22/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
25/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bathgate (64F)    
16/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 78054    
03/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane    

prev prev