Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 294 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1995 Week
» 10110 Month
» 137553 Year
» 1802929 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 78055 m/e 08/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 08/1956 to Chester Northgate (6D)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/02/1967
Service Life 10 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
6D   Chester Northgate (New) m/e 08/1956
3A   Bescot 4w/e 10/08/1957
6D   Chester Northgate 4w/e 07/09/1957
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 20/06/1959
6K   Rhyl w/e 07/11/1959
8E   Northwich w/e 17/09/1960
5B   Crewe South w/e 17/11/1962
24G   Skipton w/e 25/05/1963
8L   Aintree w/e 21/03/1964
16D   Nottingham w/e 23/05/1964
16A   Toton w/e 03/04/1965
9K   Bolton w/e 12/11/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 11/02/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 6D Chester Northgate w/e 11/08/1956
LOAN 3A Bescot 4w/e 10/08/1957
LOAN 3A Bescot 2w/e 12/08/1957
EXLOAN 6D Chester Northgate 2w/e 12/08/1957
EXLOAN 6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 8E Northwich 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 01/12/1962
ALLOC 24G Skipton 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 04/04/1964
ALLOC 16D Nottingham 5w/e 06/06/1964
ALLOC 16A Toton 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 9K Bolton 5w/e 12/11/1966
WDN   w/e 11/02/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/11/1963 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: 45494, 49395, D1031/72, 27004 and three Brush Type 4s (D1500 series). Paint Shop Yard: 44677, 45059, 45574, 48094/371/502/760, 73135, 75000, 82000, 92008, D221/49, D1030. Yard: 42668, 44500, 44676/86/762/892/904, 45139/263/280/317/736, 46119/43, 46227/31/2, 46452, 48411, 70025, 78028/62, 84013, 90630, 92068/81/178. Electric Loco. Shop: E3019, 26005/16/20, 27001/2. Outside Erecting Shop: 44696, 44726, 45072/137, 46489, 78013, 92071/109, D200/6/15, D374/81/95. Erecting Shop: 44671/712/33/59/858/927, 45013/25/106/293/403/29/34/7/91, 46434/7, 48472/725/31, 70045, 77002, 78033/55, 80105, 92013/153/68/74/82/234, D222/8/9/31/3/45/52/93/7, D303, D6769, D8001. Cut-up Shop: remains of 46158 remains. Locos. cut up at Crewe w/e 19/10: 42556/853, 45100/315, 46223, 49104; w/e 26/10-42238/79, 46224, 49408, 84012; w/e 2/11-45625/45, 46149/222/42; w/e 9/11-42157/288/319, 44309, 45521, 45706; w/e 16/11-42442, 45591, 46126/58/230/49. New construction comprised Brush Type 4s (D1500s), Western Type 4s (D1000s). SLS/196312

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 78055
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Chester Northgate (6D)
   
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
07/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (24G)    
21/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
23/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16D)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
11/02/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 78055    
06/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev