Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 254 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1955 Week
» 10070 Month
» 137513 Year
» 1802889 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 78059 m/e 09/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 2
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 09/1956 to Chester Northgate (6D)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/11/1966
Service Life 10 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
6D   Chester Northgate (New) m/e 09/1956
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 11/04/1959
6H   Bangor w/e 07/11/1959
6J   Holyhead w/e 25/04/1964
6H   Bangor w/e 31/10/1964
1A   Willesden w/e 19/06/1965
5E   Nuneaton w/e 02/10/1965
5D   Stoke w/e 04/06/1966
5B   Crewe South w/e 08/10/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 12/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 6D Chester Northgate w/e 08/09/1956
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 02/05/1959
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 6J Holyhead 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 5E Nuneaton 4w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 11/06/1966
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 08/10/1966
WDN   w/e 12/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/02/1967 Crewe South MPD (Stored) Stored-45033, 46512, 48255/502, 78019/36/59. SLS/196704
07/07/1968 Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. SLS/196810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1956 To Service To service as British Railways Number 78059
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Chester Northgate (6D)
   
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
25/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (6J)    
31/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E)    
04/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
12/11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 78059    

prev prev