Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80001 on 14/10/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sun 14/10/1952 to Polmadie (66A)
Withdrawal Sun 17/07/1966
Service Life 13 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1966 at Metal Industries (Faslane)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
66A   Polmadie (New) on 14/10/1952
68D   Beattock 4w/e 16/06/1962
66A   Polmadie 5w/e 30/05/1964
     Withdrawn on 17/07/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 66A Polmadie w/e 14/10/1952
ALLOC 68D Beattock 4w/e 09/06/1962
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 5w/e 13/06/1964
WDN   on 17/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/10/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80001
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Polmadie (66A)
   
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Beattock (68D)    
30/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
17/07/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80001    
10/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Metal Industries: Faslane    

prev prev