Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3985 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17391 Week
» 70407 Month
» 189934 Year
» 3216787 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80003 |
on |
24/10/1952 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
66B |
Motherwell |
w/e |
24/10/1952 |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
64A |
St Margarets |
4w/e |
07/07/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/03/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/05/1955 |
Clyde Coast |
Of the batch of standard class 5 engines allotted to Polmadie, Nos. 73055-73064 all work alongside class 4 2-6-4 tanks on passenger duties. The latest arrivals are 73075/6 with large tenders. Standard 2-6-4 tanks now handle almost half of the Clyde Coast passenger traffic, the remainder being of Fairburn variety. No. 80023 spent a short while on loan recently to Ladyburn, likewise No. 80003 at Princes Pier, but none of these engines is as yet stationed at Greenock. Latest arrivals at Polmadie are Doncaster-built Nos. 80111/5. New light 2-6-0 of classes 3 and 4 appear on night freight duties from the Motherwell direction; No. 77009, for a time stabled at Greenock, is now at Polmadie, while No. 77008 is at Princes Pier on passenger duties. On 25th June, No. 76001, of Perth, appeared on an excursion from Glenboig to Gourock. Class 3F Nos. 57552/6 and class 2F No. 57268 still handle the principal freight turns from Greenock; Caley Bogies Nos. 54456 an 54506 appear quite regularly on freight duty and at the end of June No. 54497 emerged after being in store for over six months. On Friday, 1st July, a 'Starlight' special left Gourock for the south at 6.45 p.m., doubleheaded by Nos. 73057 an 72000. Earlier, the stock for this train had been worked down by compound No. 41155 of Ayr shed, a type now very rare on this line. |
SLS/195508 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/10/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80003 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
06/03/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80003 |
|
|
06/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane |
|
|