Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2307 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15713 Week
» 68729 Month
» 188256 Year
» 3215109 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
80004 |
on |
04/11/1952 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/11/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 80004 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Beattock (68D) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
31/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
01/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 80004 |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|