Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 238 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5153 Week
» 16390 Month
» 249310 Year
» 1914686 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80005 on 13/11/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Tue 13/11/1952 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawal Tue 09/08/1966
Service Life 13 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
61A   Kittybrewster (New) on 13/11/1952
67A   Corkerhill 4w/e 01/08/1959
67C   Ayr 5w/e 31/10/1964
66F   Beattock 4w/e 27/03/1965
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 04/12/1965
     Withdrawn on 09/08/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 61A Kittybrewster on 13/11/1952
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 01/08/1959
ALLOC 67C Ayr 6w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 66F Beattock 3w/e 06/03/1965
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 3w/e 27/11/1965
WDN   on 09/08/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/11/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80005
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
01/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
31/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
27/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Beattock (66F)    
04/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
09/08/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80005    
10/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev