Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 297 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5212 Week
» 16449 Month
» 249369 Year
» 1914745 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80006 on 24/11/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Fri 24/11/1952 to Polmadie (66A)
Withdrawal Fri 02/09/1966
Service Life 13 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1966 at Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
66A   Polmadie (New) on 24/11/1952
68D   Beattock 4w/e 01/07/1961
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 26/08/1961
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 16/06/1962
     Withdrawn on 02/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 66A Polmadie on 24/11/1952
ALLOC 68D Beattock 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 26/08/1961
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 09/06/1962
WDN   on 02/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/11/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80006
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Polmadie (66A)
   
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Beattock (68D)    
26/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
02/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80006    
12/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane    

prev prev