Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 269 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5184 Week
» 16421 Month
» 249341 Year
» 1914717 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80007 on 08/12/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sun 08/12/1952 to Polmadie (66A)
Withdrawal Sun 17/07/1966
Service Life 13 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1966 at Metal Industries (Faslane)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
66A   Polmadie (New) on 08/12/1952
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 16/06/1962
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 04/12/1965
     Withdrawn on 17/07/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 66A Polmadie on 08/12/1952
ALLOC 64G Hawick 4w/e 19/03/1955
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 16/04/1955
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 09/06/1962
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 3w/e 27/11/1965
WDN   on 17/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/12/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80007
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Polmadie (66A)
   
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
04/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
17/07/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 80007    
10/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Metal Industries: Faslane    

prev prev