Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 256 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5171 Week
» 16408 Month
» 249328 Year
» 1914704 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80011 on 21/07/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 21/07/1951 to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)
Withdrawal Sun 09/07/1967
Service Life 15 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Birds (Risca)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
75F   Tunbridge Wells West (New) on 21/07/1951
75A   Brighton 3w/e 17/11/1956
75E   Three Bridges w/e 11/03/1959
75F   Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 30/01/1963
75A   Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963
75B   Redhill 4w/e 22/06/1964
70D   Eastleigh 4w/e 08/06/1965
70F   Bournemouth on 10/10/1965
70C   Guildford 3w/e 10/01/1966
70F   Bournemouth 4w/e 07/02/1966
     Withdrawn on 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 31/10/1956
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 8w/e 11/03/1959
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 25/01/1963
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 8w/e 22/06/1964
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh P 06/06/1965
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 4w/e 25/10/1965
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1951 New Standard Mixed Traffic 2-6-4T engines We are indebted to the Railway Executive for supplying full particulars of the new standard tank engines, the first of which was completed at Brighton in July. Two of the photographs show No. 80010, broadside and perspective, while the third shows No. 80011 with the boiler in position, but side tanks not fitted. The 54 engines included in the 1951 programme will be allocated: 21 to the Scottish, 10 to the Southern, 3 to the Eastern and North Eastern, and 20 to the London Midland Regions. Principal dimensions: Cylinders 18' x 28'; coupled wheels 5' 8' dia.; truck and bogie wheels 3' 0' dia.; wheelbase 9' 0' plus 7' 7' plus 7' 9' plus 6' 3' plus 6' 3'; coupled wheelbase 15' 4', total 36' 10'; length over buffers 44' 9⅞' (front overhang 4' 4', rear ditto 3' 7⅞'). Boiler centre 8' 9' above rail level. Tractive effort 25100lb. Boiler barrel diameter (outside) 4' 9' to 5' 3'; firebox (outside) 8' 6' x 4' 0½': distance between tubeplates 12' 3'; tubes 21 large, 5⅛' O.D. x 7 S.W.G.; 157 small, 1¾' O.D. x 12 S.W.G.; superheater elements 1⅜' O.D. x 10 S.W.G.
Heating surface: Tubes 1223 sq. ft., firebox 143 sq. ft., superheater 246 sq. ft. Grate area 26.7 sq. ft. Pressure 2251b. per sq. in. Weight in working order 86 tons 13 cwt. Water capacity 2000 gallons, bunker 34 tons coal. The engines allocated to the L.M.R. will be provided with water pick-up gear for forward and backward running, but provision is made for fitting the gear on all engines if required. Ten of the engines are to be built at Derby (Nos. 80000-80009) and the remainder at Brighton, of which Nos. 80010/1 were running from Brighton shed during the latter part of July, the former having been noted on the 11.5 a.m. to Victoria, via Oxted, and No. 80011 on local trips to Steyning, etc.
SLS/195109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/07/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80011
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)
   
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
30/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
10/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
10/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
07/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
09/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 80011    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Risca    

prev prev