Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 217 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 5132 Week
» 16369 Month
» 249289 Year
» 1914665 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80012 on 17/08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Sun 17/08/1951 to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)
Withdrawal Sun 19/03/1967
Service Life 15 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1967 at Buttigiegs (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
75F   Tunbridge Wells West (New) on 17/08/1951
75A   Brighton 4w/e 22/03/1958
75E   Three Bridges w/e 11/03/1959
75D   Stewarts Lane 3w/e 30/01/1963
70B   Feltham 4w/e 24/06/1963
70D   Eastleigh w/e 20/11/1964
70A   Nine Elms 4w/e 25/10/1965
     Withdrawn on 19/03/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 75F Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 05/09/1951
NEW 75F Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 75A Brighton 7w/e 10/04/1958
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 8w/e 11/03/1959
ALLOC 75D Stewarts Lane 3w/e 25/01/1963
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 24/06/1963
ALLOC 70D Eastleigh 2w/e 20/11/1964
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 25/10/1965
WDN   w/e 19/03/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/08/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80012
Built at Brighton Works
Allocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)
   
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
11/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
30/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D)    
24/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
20/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
25/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
19/03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 80012    
08/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Buttigiegs: Newport    

prev prev