Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 991 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2065 Week
» 27426 Month
» 260346 Year
» 1925722 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 80021 on 10/11/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4 Tank
Company History BR
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service Mon 10/11/1951
Withdrawal Mon 13/07/1964
Service Life 12 yrs, 8 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1965 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 10/11/1951
67D   Ardrossan 4w/e 01/07/1961
67A   Corkerhill 4w/e 29/07/1961
     Withdrawn on 13/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 61A Kittybrewster on 10/11/1951
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 29/07/1961
WDN   w/e 13/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/12/1951 Scottish Miscellany Of the B.R. 2-6-4T Nos. 80020-2 are at Kittybrewster, 80023/6 at Polmadie and 80024/5 at Corkerhill. Ivatt 2-6-0 43133 has arrived at Eastfield depot. Ex-L.M.S. Class 5 4-6-0s now work regularly over the West Highland line. During the New Year week V2 class engines worked frequently on the Edinburgh-Glasgow turns. Towards the end of December Class J39 64750 was noted being towed to Cowlairs Works after a 'pitch-in.' Regular Sunday cheap day excursion tickets are now being given from Glasgow to more distant towns, e.g., by 7.15 a.m. to Grantown-on-Spey West; Hawick by 9.40 a.m. SLS/195203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/11/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 80021
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
29/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
13/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 80021    
03/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev